Trustees EXETER U3A
Charity number: 1104480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Jane Hydar | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Barwell | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Martin Fabian | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Louise Harper | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Donald Murray | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Dominique Nater-Andreae | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Jane Hannah Morgan | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Ancell | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Peter Cross | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Albert Parsons | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Crichton-Smith | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Ward | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.