Accounts and annual returns THE WATH SAMWAIES TRUST

Charity number: 1104918
Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 February 2020 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required