THE WELLINGTON SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the charitable work of Wellington School by the raising of funds for new scholarships and bursaries and investing the funds to maximise their value to support Wellington School in its aim of providing an education for children from all walks of life no matter what their financial circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 13 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Darvall | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Rolfe Lungley | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Palfrey | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WEEKES BA | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Phillips | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ALAN HOOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.47k | £183.40k | £174.35k | £187.36k | £308.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.36k | £804.14k | £159.64k | £118.55k | £181.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 May 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 September 2020 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/2007 as amended on 25 Jun 2021 as amended on 23 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS 3.1. The objects of the Charity are: 3.1.1. to promote the charitable work of Wellington School 1837 (being a company registered with Companies House for England and Wales under number 09316033, and registered with the Charity Commission for England and Wales under number 1161447); 3.1.2. to further the education and the advancement in life of present and past pupils of Wellington School through the provision of scholarships, bursaries and grants, and such other means as the Trustees shall consider appropriate from time to time; 3.1.3. to preserve for the benefit of the public the school Chapel and such other parts of the school site as are worthy of preservation in view of their historical, architectural or environmental significance; 3.1.4. to promote the education principally but not exclusively of persons resident or working in Wellington and its environs through the provision of teaching and the facilities for learning and in such other ways and on such terms as the Trustees shall consider appropriate; 3.1.5. to promote community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of persons resident or working in Wellington and its environs by the provision of instruction and facilities for the same on such terms as the Trustees shall consider appropriate; and 3.1.6. to further such other charitable purposes as the Trustees shall from time to time decide; (the “Objects”). 3.2. This Article 3 may be amended by special resolution but only with the prior written consent of the Commission.
Area of benefit
WELLINGTON, SOMERSET
Linked charities
- 13 September 2007 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
WELLINGTON SCHOOL
SOUTH STREET
WELLINGTON
TA21 8NT
- Phone:
- 01823668806
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window