ST ANDREW'S COMMUNITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1105307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £276.69k £274.97k £402.41k £581.79k £584.01k
Total expenditure £280.31k £281.85k £400.30k £486.94k £475.18k
Income from government contracts £683 £0 N/A £6.50k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k £10.00k £30.00k £35.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £191.34k £310.33k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £32.22k £39.16k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £358.23k £234.52k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £486.94k £475.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £975 £875
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0