THE COLLEGE OR HALL OF VALENCE MARY COMMONLY PEMBROKE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 23 January 2017 On time Download