ANIMALS IN DISTRESS (TORBAY AND WESTCOUNTRY)

Charity number: 1105487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.30m £1.28m £1.74m £1.55m £1.48m
Total expenditure £1.80m £1.57m £1.58m £1.57m £1.61m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £1.07k £900
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £298.21k £304.58k £803.60k £591.60k £468.72k
Income - Other trading activities £927.08k £899.21k £871.13k £890.67k £932.08k
Income - Charitable activities £56.77k £53.69k £47.52k £47.46k £61.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.48k £20.64k £20.00k £21.77k £21.18k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £170.99k £200.59k £627.32k £431.65k £310.66k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £805.67k £745.01k £758.74k £775.84k £818.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £822.45k £816.65k £789.78k £786.97k
Expenditure - Governance £16.30k £0 £13.12k £10.20k £7.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.54k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £806 £0 £0 £0