ST JOHN'S ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1106467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 13 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 September 2019 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 24 April 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 20 July 2017 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required