Accounts and annual returns THE ST PETER'S COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 June 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 June 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window