Accounts and annual returns THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST

Charity number: 1108369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window