QALANDAR CONSCIOUS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1110332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 July 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 July 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 July 2018 22 September 2019 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 July 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 06 July 2016 12 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2016 Not Required