Dogfen lywodraethu BEACON SOUTH YORKSHIRE LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 DEC 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 APR 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. OBJECTS TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND NEEDS OF PARENTS AND CARERS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF DRUG USERS BY: 1) ESTABLISHING AND DEVELOPING A SERVICE WHICH PROVIDES HELP, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO THEM; 2) PROVIDING A SAFE, COMFORTABLE ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH TO HOLD A PARENT AND FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP; 3) RAISING AWARENESS AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT DRUGS AND DRUG RELATED ISSUES AND BY OFFERING TRAINING AND EDUCATION ON MATTERS SUCH AS COUNSELLING; AND 4) OFFERING INDIAN HEAD MASSAGE, HAND AND FOOT MASSAGE, REFLEXOLOGY AND REIKI AS COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.