Governing document BEACON SOUTH YORKSHIRE LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 DEC 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 APR 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND NEEDS OF PARENTS AND CARERS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF DRUG USERS BY: 1) ESTABLISHING AND DEVELOPING A SERVICE WHICH PROVIDES HELP, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO THEM; 2) PROVIDING A SAFE, COMFORTABLE ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH TO HOLD A PARENT AND FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP; 3) RAISING AWARENESS AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT DRUGS AND DRUG RELATED ISSUES AND BY OFFERING TRAINING AND EDUCATION ON MATTERS SUCH AS COUNSELLING; AND 4) OFFERING INDIAN HEAD MASSAGE, HAND AND FOOT MASSAGE, REFLEXOLOGY AND REIKI AS COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.