Financial history BEACON SOUTH YORKSHIRE LTD

Charity number: 1117760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.23k £132.98k £132.93k £230.61k £221.22k
Total expenditure £71.73k £94.78k £140.19k £209.77k £223.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k £45.12k £101.19k £40.00k