Trustees OXFORD LIEDER

Charity number: 1111458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL JONATHON HAMWAY Chair
THE PROGRESS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CORPORATION OF THE HALL OF ARTS AND SCIENCES
Received: On time
Andrew Hamish Forsyth Trustee 16 May 2022
THE MILA CHARITABLE ORGANISATION
Received: On time
Professor Lord John Richard Krebs Kt FRS Trustee 12 July 2019
THE SIR HANS KREBS TRUST
Received: On time
CHARLES ALAN HEATHCOTE ALEXANDER Trustee 13 July 2018
THE WARDEN AND SCHOLARS OF THE HOUSE OR COLLEGE OF SCHOLARS OF MERTON IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
DRAGON SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
SARAH TAYLOR Trustee 04 July 2017
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THAME HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Charles Edmund Francis Naylor Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record
Nicola Creed Trustee 02 December 2014
THE LEONARD INGRAMS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JULIAN HALL Trustee 10 May 2011
None on record