Accounts and annual returns LIFECARE UK

Charity number: 1113964
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 February 2023 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 February 2023 735 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 08 April 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required