Accounts and annual returns COPLESTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1116694
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 January 2022 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 January 2022 87 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 January 2020 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 January 2020 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window