Accounts and annual returns JIGSAW (BURY)

Charity number: 1115643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 02 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 02 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 24 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window