Trustees JIGSAW (BURY)

Charity number: 1115643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Ferguson Chair 13 July 2017
None on record
James Stephen Thornton Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Verity Kay Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Michael Gwyn Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Rebecca Lunness Trustee 01 October 2015
BURY PEOPLE FIRST
Received: On time
Liam Collinge Trustee 14 June 2014
None on record