MAKE A DIFFERENCE, TAVISTOCK

Charity number: 1115769
Charity reporting is 28 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not yet received
28 days overdue
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 June 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 March 2018 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 15 February 2017 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)