Financial history THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR BUDDHIST STUDIES

Charity number: 1114960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £190.76k £81.26k £63.14k £48.95k £89.83k
Total expenditure £65.80k £78.19k £87.68k £101.53k £70.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A