Financial history ASPIRE COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE (SHEFFIELD) LTD

Charity number: 1116421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £100.60k £120.93k £123.86k £123.86k £145.36k
Total expenditure £103.70k £115.15k £115.88k £115.88k £130.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £3.05k £1.82k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.00k £10.00k