Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST ANNES CHURCH CATTERICK VILLAGE

Charity number: 1115962
Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 211 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 211 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required