Accounts and annual returns THAMIL COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1117267
Charity reporting is overdue by 846 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 846 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 846 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required