CHRIST THE ROCK INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1120229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 August 2020 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 July 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 July 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required