Accounts and annual returns INNOVATIVE DEVELOPMENT ALTERNATIVES (IDA)

Charity number: 1117885
Charity reporting is overdue by 1729 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 268 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 268 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 633 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 633 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 998 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 998 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1363 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1363 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1729 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1729 days