SOHAM ACTION 4 YOUTH

Charity number: 1119761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 23 October 2020 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 06 April 2019 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 05 January 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 23 February 2017 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required