ST HILDA'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1137537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 28 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 28 March 2017 On time Download