THE SURREY CRICKET BOARD

Charity number: 1118770
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.06m £1.04m £1.12m £1.38m £1.05m
Total expenditure £958.23k £1.07m £1.17m £1.22m £960.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £654.19k £718.23k £740.92k £975.88k £822.53k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £408.90k £324.30k £373.67k £404.42k £230.90k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £391 £0 £1.08k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £182.00k £30.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £911.99k £1.06m £1.16m £1.20m £959.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.24k £3.32k £8.09k £17.93k £220
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £2.00k £9.60k £9.60k £9.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £52.61k £0 £100.96k £106.71k £32.74k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0