SUTTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People
9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 08 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Barbara McCormick | Chair | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Francis Perry | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Kelly | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Daniels | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sharn Louise Elton | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jason Robert Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE REAM | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Scott McKenzie | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEFAN SENGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.70k | £14.75k | £24.18k | £17.68k | £15.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.95k | £5.22k | £6.19k | £12.30k | £9.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.69k | £5.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 November 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT 14 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SUTTON, SANDY, BEDFORDSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 High Street
Sutton
Sandy
SG19 2NE
- Phone:
- 01767 260432
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window