CAMBRIDGE FILM TRUST

Charity number: 1120059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 18 October 2016 On time Download