BURMALINK UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burmalink UK provides education, health and human rights assistance to Burmese people in Thailand and inside Burma.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burma
- Thailand
Governance
- 02 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONY Stokle | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PETER MULLIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SAGAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE STOKLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL PHILIP BOWMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £1.71k | £1.81k | £1.95k | £1.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £1.00k | £1.00k | £300 | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 06 February 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BURMESE PEOPLE IN REFUGEE CAMPS AND DISPLACED COMMUNITIES IN BURMA AND THAILAND. 2. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONGST BURMESE PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THAILAND OR ARE DISPLACED WITHIN BURMA. 3. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UN CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN BURMA (AN WITHIN REFUGEE CAMPS AND DISPLACED COMMUNITIES IN THAILAND) BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS. A) RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES B) EDUCATION THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS C) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 WOODBINE ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1DE
- Phone:
- 01912859820
- Email:
- tonystokle1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window