Dogfen lywodraethu Linkable Woking
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/11/2013 as amended on 08 Nov 2023 as amended on 08 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE HEALTHY, HAPPY AND INDEPENDENT LIVES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WOKING
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.