Accounts and annual returns BURY ST EDMUNDS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1119059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 December 2019 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 December 2019 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window