VITTORIA PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 March 2021 417 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 July 2019 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 June 2017 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required