ASAMAI CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 1123000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2016 On time Download