EAST ANGLIAN RUSSIAN AND INTERNATIONAL CULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1121269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required