Accounts and annual returns THE BRYAN AND SIRKKA SANDERSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119129
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 June 2023 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 October 2020 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required