Financial history ASIAN RESOURCE CENTRE OF CROYDON LIMITED

Charity number: 1120376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £379.51k £358.49k £344.90k £497.64k £622.12k
Total expenditure £276.46k £303.38k £354.59k £399.12k £514.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £140.00k £109.00k £129.83k
Income from government grants £165.00k £145.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £605.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.87k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £86
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £9
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £514.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £52.26k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0