MASTER FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF PEMBROKE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1137498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £10.96m £11.73m £12.71m £14.79m £13.83m
Total expenditure £11.12m £11.35m £11.67m £16.94m £12.72m
Income from government contracts £47.11k £90.62k £89.47k £47.24k £124.49k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £12.60k £10.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.39m £2.78m £2.15m £2.76m £2.98m
Income - Other trading activities £1.45m £1.50m £1.74m £2.17m £971.00k
Income - Charitable activities £6.17m £6.61m £6.73m £7.51m £6.82m
Income - Endowments £1.03m £1.37m £340.00k £1.00m £342.00k
Income - Investment £1.94m £2.22m £2.10m £2.35m £3.05m
Income - Other £32.00k £0 £0 £0 £345.00k
Income - Legacies £64.00k £44.01k £410.33k £14.03k £12.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.07m £9.19m £9.63m £14.67m £10.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.05m £2.17m £2.05m £2.27m £1.89m
Expenditure - Governance £23.00k £31.00k £29.00k £31.00k £33.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £387.00k £437.00k £271.00k £376.00k £526.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0