MASTER FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF PEMBROKE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1137498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

50 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROF LYNDA MUGGLESTONE Trustee None on record
PROF JONATHAN REES Trustee None on record
PROF BENJAMIN DAVIS Trustee None on record
PROF ANDREW JAMES BALDWIN Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Dr Ushashi Dasgupta Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Dr TIMOTHY FARRANT Trustee None on record
PROF GUY KAHANE Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
PROF ANDRE FURGER Trustee None on record
Professor Henrietta Katherine Harrison Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Prof Roberto Salguero-Gomez Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
PROF ANDREW PHILIP McDOWELL ORCHARD Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
PROF THEO MAARTEN VAN LINT Trustee None on record
PROF RAPHAEL HAUSER Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR ANANDI MANI Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Michael Peter Naworynsky Trustee 25 February 2013
HINTON WALDRIST VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
PROF INGMAR POSNER Trustee 12 March 2012 None on record
PROF SANDRA FREDMAN Trustee 12 March 2012 None on record
PROF CHRISTOPHER MELCHERT Trustee None on record
PROF JUSTIN RHYS JONES Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
STEPHEN GOSZTONY Trustee 01 September 2017
Royal Academy Trust Received: On time
SIR JOHN SOANE'S MUSEUM Received: On time
Nancy Braithwaite Trustee 07 September 2015
PEMBROKE COLLEGE OXFORD JCR ART COLLECTION FUND Overdue by 202 days
PROF ARIEL EZRACHI Trustee None on record
PROF HANNAH ELIZABETH SMITHSON Trustee 12 March 2012 None on record
ALICE GOSLING Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Professor Pramila Krishnan Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
MIKE WAGSTAFF Trustee 12 March 2012 None on record
Dr EAMONN MOLLOY Trustee
THE ROYAL AIR FORCE CENTRAL FUND Received: On time
PROF CLIVE SIVIOUR Trustee None on record
NICK HAWES Trustee 04 September 2017 None on record
PROF MIN CHEN PHD FBCS F Trustee 12 March 2012 None on record
PROF NICOLAI SINAI Trustee 12 March 2012 None on record
PROF REBECCA WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
PROF JEREMY TAYLOR Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR DAMIAN ROSSLER Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
PROF ALFONS WEBER Trustee 15 February 2013
ATOM FESTIVAL OF SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY Received: On time
Sir Ernest Nigel Ryder Chair 01 July 2020 None on record
PROF TIM JAMES WOOLINGS Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
James Alexander Mabyn Read Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR GUIDO BONSAVER Trustee
THE MODERN HUMANITIES RESEARCH ASSOCIATION Received: On time
JOHN EDWIN CHURCH Trustee 01 January 2019
DR JOHNSON'S HOUSE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
ST. CLARE'S, OXFORD Received: On time
THE OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time
NUFFIELD ORTHOPAEDIC CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
PROF STEPHEN WHITEFIELD Trustee None on record
PROF STEPHEN TUCK Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR KEVIN TALBOT Trustee 01 January 2020
THE GUARANTORS OF BRAIN Received: 16 days late
PROF OWEN DARBISHIRE Trustee None on record
REV DR ANDREW TEAL Trustee None on record
PROF NICHOLAS JOHN KRUGER Trustee None on record
PROF LINDA FLORES Trustee None on record
PROF ADRIAN GREGORY Trustee None on record
Dr PETER CLAUS Trustee 16 October 2013
THE ORWELL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr BRIAN A'HEARN Trustee None on record