Accounts and annual returns UNION OF OLD ST MONICANS (UK)

Charity number: 1122118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 January 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 January 2018 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required