THE SOCIAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 October 2019 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 15 October 2019 137 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 19 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 26 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 26 May 2017 On time Download