LANCASHIRE CRICKET FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1121855
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 October 2016 On time Download