Trustees FRIENDS OF THE WILLIAM HARVEY HOSPITAL
Charity number: 1122585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN HERITAGE | Chair | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Kathleen Ann Trent | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Olive Bower | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Lester Kennedy | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Valerie Ann Kennedy | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joy McCue | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Moore | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.