Accounts and annual returns BOURNEMOUTH AND POOLE HEALTHCARE TRUST

Charity number: 1122497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 February 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 February 2019 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window