Governing document BOLTON DEMENTIA SUPPORT
Charity number: 1123776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 05/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 20/08/2014 as amended on 09 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS THROUGH SUCH ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LANCASHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.