VOICE FOR THE VOICELESS UK

Charity number: 1123795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2020 06 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2019 26 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2017 12 October 2018 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2016 02 March 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2016 Not Required