Financial history BRITISH SOCIETY OF BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION AND CELLULAR THERAPY

Charity number: 1125795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £376.75k £361.95k £350.29k £388.04k £341.73k
Total expenditure £317.80k £339.00k £372.21k £335.36k £393.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £171.08k N/A N/A £183.42k
Income from government grants £0 £171.08k £171.08k £180.33k N/A