ST JOSEPH'S NURSERY

Charity number: 1123537
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 07 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 29 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 29 November 2016 On time Download