ADVENTURE UNDER SAIL

Charity number: 1124276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 20 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 21 February 2017 On time Download